TOWN LANDS (ESTATE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Town Farm, East Harling, 12 Spinney Drive East Harling, 11 Kemps Barn East Harling, and 46 Garlondes, East Harling, paying net proceeds, in equal shares, to Harling Parish Church, Harling Town Lands Educational Foundation and Harling Town Improvement Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 September 1962: Standard registration
- Harling Town Lands Trust (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP EDGE | Chair |
|
||||||
JEAN DOROTHY DENNISS | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
REBECCA JACOBS | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jubb | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Copping | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Justin John JACOBS | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JUBB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.17k | £10.75k | £19.04k | £22.39k | £36.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £10.92k | £22.18k | £5.20k | £24.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 20TH JUNE 1893 AND 27TH MAY 1898 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JUL 2024
Charitable objects
THE INCOME FROM THE ESTATE CHARITY SHALL BE DIVIDED AT THE TRUSTEES’ DISCRETION AND APPLIED AS FOLLOWS TO: A) THE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL IN THE PARISH OF EAST HARLING; B) THE EAST HARLING PARISH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION; AND C) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST HARLING THE MINIMUM SHARE RECEIVED SHALL BE 20% OF THE INCOME AVAILABLE UNLESS THE RECEIVING BODY HAS AGREED FOR IT TO BE LOWER.
Area of benefit
EAST HARLING
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Gallants Lane
East Harling
NORWICH
NR16 2NQ
- Phone:
- 01953717800
- Email:
- copping222@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window