THE CHURCH ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with the Trusts Deed the Charity raises funds which are distributed towards the Maintenance of Divine Worship at St. Marys Thurnham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 16 November 1962: Standard registration
- THURNHAM CHURCH ESTATE (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hillary Nicola Reid | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joan Renton | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Dione Nyangon | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROBERT TUGWELL | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.93k | £24.03k | £34.81k | £43.94k | £39.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.27k | £17.11k | £29.76k | £15.81k | £67.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2024 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 January 2024 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2023 | 570 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2022 | 754 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2022 | 754 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REPORTED VOLUME 30 P 398, SCHEME DATED 15/9/1877 AND RESOLUTION DATED 22/5/2012
Charitable objects
ONE HALF OF INCOME TO UPKEEP OF THE FABRIC OF THURNHAM CHURCH OTHER HALF TO MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THURNHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Saith Vicarage
Weavering Street
Weavering
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5JQ
- Phone:
- 01622630598
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window