Financial history KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES

Charity number: 212358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £58.50k £66.45k £69.05k £71.40k £76.96k
Total expenditure £39.83k £48.20k £51.11k £60.97k £93.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A