Financial history THE WING HALL

Charity number: 212601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £71.22k £83.55k £79.12k £80.33k £76.77k
Total expenditure £62.29k £68.92k £64.44k £73.22k £78.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.10k N/A N/A N/A