Financial history THE VILLAGE HALL CHURCH LENCH

Charity number: 212660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £15.18k £26.89k £11.41k £13.37k £14.82k
Total expenditure £12.94k £21.65k £14.53k £13.12k £15.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.43k £2.10k N/A N/A