THE LONDON SHIPOWNERS' AND SHIPBROKERS' BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity Number: 213348
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping those who are or have been employed in the business of ship-owning and shipbroking, and who are in necessitous circumstances, and their widows dependants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £4,259
Total expenditure: £32,055

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1962: Standard registration
  • 17 October 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £21.57k £19.59k £18.53k £12.88k £4.26k
Total expenditure £57.48k £47.54k £41.27k £35.92k £32.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LETTER DATED 6 OCTOBER 1981.
Charitable objects
TO GRANT RELIEF BY PENSIONS OR DONATIONS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED AS PRINCIPALS, OR AS MANAGERS OR DIRECTORS OF LIMITED COMPANIES, IN THE BUSINESS OF SHIPBROKERS OR SHIPOWNERS IN THE CITY OF LONDON OR THEIR WIDOWS, DEPENDANTS OR UNMARRID DAUGHTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 06 December 1962 : Standard registration
  • 17 October 2024 : Removed