JAPAN CHRISTIAN LINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping establish outreach work to Japanese expatriate communities; promoting & supporting the advancement of the gospel in Japan; raising awareness of the spiritual need of the Japanese people; engaging the Christian community in prayer, giving, oureach & mission; being a resource centre, linking people, providing Japanese literature & arranging conferences, mentoring mission partners & others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Japan
Governance
- 06 February 1963: Standard registration
- 09 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- J E B (Working name)
- JCL (Working name)
- JAPAN EVANGELISTIC BAND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.98k | £221.60k | £223.98k | £212.80k | £262.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.14k | £200.42k | £225.88k | £183.62k | £254.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 23 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 23 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 05 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 05 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/1950 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/1996 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2000
Charitable objects
THE PRIMARY PURPOSE OF JCL IS THE ADVANCEMENT RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO GLORIFY GOD THROUGH THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL TO JAPANESE, WHEREVER THEY MAY BE IN THE WORLD. THE SECONDARY PURPOSE OF JCL IS TO SUPPORT AND BUILD UP JAPANESE CHRISTIANS IN THEIR FAITH THROUGH PARTNERSHIP AND COOPERATION WITH OTHER CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR AIMS..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 06 February 1963 : Standard registration
- 09 February 2016 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window