Financial history THE JANE MADDOCK HOMES

Charity number: 213904
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £26.18k £25.06k £26.22k £27.28k £28.35k
Total expenditure £20.68k £16.07k £18.94k £42.31k £15.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A