THE SAVAGE CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Occasional financial help for those Savage Club members in straitened circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Robert Woodcock Mr | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Sam Armstrong | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
David Newson | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Barrett | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.48k | £34.49k | £25.96k | £24.74k | £24.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.39k | £41.81k | £30.02k | £14.56k | £14.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 July 2024 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST MEMBERS AND EX-MEMBERS OF THE SAVAGE CLUB AND THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS AND DECEASED EX-MEMBERS WHO THROUGH MISFORTUNE REQUIRE ASSISTANCE FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Whitehall Place
1 Whitehall Place
LONDON
SW1A 2HD
- Phone:
- 020 7930 8118
- Email:
- dave.newson@savageclub.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window