Financial history NORTH LOPHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 214897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.39k £3.59k £3.71k £4.17k £5.50k
Total expenditure £2.02k £1.67k £3.79k £4.15k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A