THE RELIGIOUS DRAMA SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 214943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Radius welcomes those seeking to explore spiritual, social and ethical themes through drama. As a forum for discussion it encourages a relationship between theatre and faith within contemporary culture and promotes plays that throw light on the human condition. It offers scripts for performance, an assessment service for new plays, a series of study guides, a magazine and a programme of workshops.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £10,614
Total expenditure: £16,041

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1963: Standard registration
  • 08 June 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RADIUS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Carlson Trustee 23 September 2023
NEW FELLOWSHIP CIO
Received: On time
Jennifer Ansell Trustee 23 September 2023
None on record
Nick Warburton Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
MARGARET FULFORD Trustee 09 July 2022
None on record
Nicolette Cox Trustee 18 September 2021
None on record
Rev Romilly Janes Trustee 19 September 2020
None on record
DILYS STONE Trustee 04 September 2010
ABERCONWY MISSION AREA
Received: On time
MARGARET JANE HUNT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.60k £4.48k £6.70k £6.62k £10.61k
Total expenditure £9.27k £11.88k £13.90k £12.45k £16.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 March 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 16 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION. INCORPORATED 19/08/1938
Charitable objects
TO ENGAGE IN THE PROMOTION AND PRESENTATION OF RELIGIOUS PLAYS AND OTHER THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS WHICH EXPLORE AND INTERPRET THE CHRISTIAN VIEW OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 08 March 1963 : Standard registration
  • 08 June 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
4 Carpenter Avenue
LLANDUDNO
LL30 1YW
Phone:
01492 879997