ANN WILLIAMS ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 215268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION FOR ELDERLY PERSONS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £28,919
Total expenditure: £30,630

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CWMDU ALMS HOUSE CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID MALCOLM THOMAS Chair
None on record
Christopher Evans Trustee 30 October 2023
CWMDU WATER UNDERTAKING
Received: On time
CWMDU AND DISTRICT SHOW
Received: On time
THE CWMDU WATER UNDERTAKING
Received: On time
CWMDU VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
JANICE ELIZABETH BLOCK Trustee 07 July 2022
VEDW WOOD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CWMDU MUSIC
Received: On time
Colin James Morris Trustee 06 June 2019
VEDW WOOD
Received: On time
Rev Rana Khan Trustee 08 June 2017
LLANGATTOCK COMMUNITY EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
PARISH HOUSE CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
THE HENRY MARTYN TRUST
Received: On time
THE PERCY DAVIES INSTITUTION
Received: On time
CHRISTIANS AWARE
Received: On time
THE OVERSEAS BISHOPRICS' FUND
Received: On time
Winston Farr Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.13k £8.90k £13.91k £8.91k £28.92k
Total expenditure £3.56k £3.45k £18.41k £7.71k £30.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 17 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD HOUSE
CWMDU
CRICKHOWELL
NP8 1SA
Phone:
07980543328
Website:

No information available