Financial history PRESTWOLD PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 215569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.07k £1.98k £3.39k £4.38k £2.00k
Total expenditure £1.69k £2.07k £1.00k £2.30k £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A