THE FRIENDS OF HEREFORD CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 215663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To encourage interest in Hereford Cathedral and to supplement available resources for maintenance of its fabric and furnishings and for improvement and beautification of the cathedral and its precincts, including education and music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £158,886
Total expenditure: £54,705

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire
  • Herefordshire
  • Powys
  • Shropshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr BARBARA JOY RODERICK Chair 08 June 2012
None on record
Dr Carole Jane Caldwell Trustee 08 June 2024
None on record
Clive Walker Trustee 08 June 2024
None on record
Sarah Warner Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Paul Wynne Griffiths Trustee 11 June 2022
None on record
Isobel Willmott Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
David Owen Trustee 08 June 2019
None on record
Iris Eileen Howlett Trustee 08 June 2019
None on record
Erica Mary Hillman Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Wg Cdr Peter John Hereford OBE Trustee 15 June 2013
None on record
Dr THOMAS DOUGLAS RODERICK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £55.35k £44.28k £38.09k £182.09k £158.89k
Total expenditure £49.54k £42.34k £21.52k £50.64k £54.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Friends of Hereford Cathedral
5 College Cloisters
HEREFORD
Cathedral Close
Hereford
HR1 2NG
Phone:
01432274783
Website:

No information available