Financial history THE PECKHAM SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 215925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.28k £27.41k £42.83k £24.24k £72.38k
Total expenditure £38.85k £40.23k £25.18k £38.44k £58.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A