Financial history ST MARY MAGDALEN AND ST JOHN THE BAPTIST HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity number: 215990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £97.37k £131.11k £96.85k £102.22k £110.47k
Total expenditure £35.69k £157.84k £119.20k £337.67k £90.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A