Accounts and annual returns UNKNOWN DONOR'S CHARITY

Charity number: 216015
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required