LANCES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 216226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

charitable trust provides housing for 2 single older women

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,193
Total expenditure: £1,953

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Helen Reeves Trustee 02 April 2019
None on record
Ian Adrian Nurdin Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record
Enid Mary Viney Trustee 24 October 2017
None on record
ROXANA MARY ELIZABETH BRAMMER Trustee
ASH VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.74k £5.88k £5.94k £6.17k £7.19k
Total expenditure £3.25k £1.09k £2.47k £3.00k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 Bowes Wood
New Ash Green
LONGFIELD
Kent
DA3 8QJ
Phone:
01474872763
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available