THE CONSERVATIVE AND UNIONIST AGENTS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of benefits to retired Conservtaive Party Agents and their dependents or serving Agents and their dependents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 1963: Standard registration
- C U A B A (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ANTHONY GARRETT CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hayward Burt | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ward Simpson CBE | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Edward James Cockram | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Johnson | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Perry CBE | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sproat | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Houghton | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.23k | £51.45k | £33.92k | £1.37k | £15.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £314.49k | £273.49k | £268.50k | £239.56k | £241.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20TH NOVEMBER 1951 AS AMENDED IN 1952, 1956, 1959, 1962, 1969, 1970 AND ON 30 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEVOLENT PURPOSE OF AFFORDING ASSISTANCE BY DONATIONS, GRANTS OR OTHERWISE TO NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN FOR A MINIMUM OFTEN YEARS, FULL OR ASSOCIATE MEMBERS OF THE NATIONAL SOCIETY OF CONSERVATIVE AND UNIONIST AGENTS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SOCIETY") AND THEIR DEPENDANTS AND THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Winston Close
Nether Heyford
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 3JX
- Phone:
- 07831273784
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window