Financial history THE BALTIC LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 216473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.53k £1.30k £0 £516 £1.52k
Total expenditure £600 £4.98k £0 £0 £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A