Financial history THE HANDSWORTH CHARITY

Charity number: 216603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £26.01k £34.26k £36.86k £37.97k £36.76k
Total expenditure £63.51k £49.35k £42.16k £35.25k £23.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A