THE MUNTZ TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Muntz Trust makes donations to assist with running costs of Birmingham based charitable organisations not primarily supported by the public rate, for medical, surgical or research purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 06 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Muntz | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Zafar Iqbal | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Locke | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Carty | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRONWEN LLOYD LILLEY | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SORTON DARBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISTAIR DOW | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT FREDERICK MUNTZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
GORDON JOHN FRANKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £4.72k | £4.82k | £7.94k | £7.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £7.50k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED THE 7TH NOVEMBER, 1890
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONG CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM FOR THE MEDICAL AND SURGICAL RELIEF OR ALLEVIATON OF SICKNESS AND BODILY INFIRMITIES OR DEFORMITIES INCLUSIVE OF HOSPITALS OR HOMES FOR INCURABLES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DEEM MOST DESERVING OF PECUNIARY ASSISTANCE AND IN SUCH AMOUNTS AND GENERALLY IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM EXPEDIENT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BEECHES
TITHE BARN LANE
HOCKLEY HEATH
SOLIHULL
B94 5DH
- Phone:
- 08450953476
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window