Financial history ELIZABETH DOWELL'S TRUST

Charity number: 217309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £192.42k £187.01k £222.84k £250.32k £263.29k
Total expenditure £159.17k £196.99k £197.41k £232.43k £284.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A