Financial history BURFORD ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 217522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.36k £7.37k £8.26k £8.42k £8.15k
Total expenditure £7.87k £7.61k £9.17k £11.29k £8.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A