Financial history LUTTERWORTH TOWN ESTATE

Charity Number: 217609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £63.26k £221.87k £66.76k £67.68k £88.40k
Total expenditure £42.47k £24.80k £99.86k £76.15k £88.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £155.75k N/A N/A N/A