Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HALL - HOLBEACH

Charity number: 217634
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 January 2025 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 January 2025 458 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required