Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HALL - HOLBEACH

Charity number: 217634
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.26k £17.33k £27.25k £19.00k £20.24k
Total expenditure £10.03k £13.07k £17.27k £18.13k £29.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A