Financial history SEAGRAVE WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 218276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £28.60k £29.49k £28.77k £29.85k £41.87k
Total expenditure £38.74k £11.71k £33.35k £32.61k £43.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.84k £2.67k N/A N/A