Financial history THE REVEREND MAURICE VAUGHAN

Charity number: 218282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.54k £14.62k £14.59k £8.75k £8.64k
Total expenditure £3.63k £10.08k £4.49k £4.76k £4.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A