Financial history THE ST THOMAS'S DAY CHARITIES

Charity number: 219577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £108 £90 £97 £115 £103
Total expenditure £130 £115 £75 £135 £70
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A