Financial history THE CARLTON HAYES MENTAL HEALTH CHARITY

Charity number: 219783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £196.15k £191.59k £196.81k £199.69k £201.07k
Total expenditure £194.24k £244.64k £217.27k £181.46k £210.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A