STAFFORDSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals Makes grants to small local organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
97 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 30 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Philips | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW GIBBONS | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Raymond Haynes | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL STIRLING RAWLE | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
STUART SCOTT | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.73k | £23.54k | £27.37k | £40.05k | £40.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.25k | £47.70k | £37.09k | £46.55k | £41.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES APPROVED 14 MAY 1945 AS AMENDED ON 1 APRIL 1985, 1 SEPTEMBER 1994, 13 JUNE 1996, 28 JUNE 2000 AND 26 JUNE 2002, AND 27 JUNE 2007,
Charitable objects
TO RENDER EFFECTIVE THE COLLECTION, APPLICATION AND ADMINISTRATION OF FUNDS RAISED IN THE PROVINCE FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHETHER FOR MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHERWISE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT THESE OBJECTS, THERE SHALL BE FUNDS (I) A FUND WHICH SHALL CONSIST OF ALL SUBSCRIPTIONS AND DONATIONS RECEIVED IN THE PROVINCE FOR AND ON BEHALF OF THE MASONIC CHARITIES. (II) AFUND TO BE RAISED BY SUBSCRIPTIONS, SPPECIAL APPEALS OR OTHER MEANS AND TO BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF (A) MAKING GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF POR AND DISTRESSED FREEMASONS OF THE PROVINCE THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN (B) MAKING GRANTS TO RECOGNISED CHARITIES, WHETHER MASONIC OR OTHERWISE AND IN GIVING RELIEF IN OTHER CASES OF NEED OR DISTRESS WITHIN THE PROVINCE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITEE MAY THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SMCA
5 Shaw Park Business Village
Shaw Road
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 9LE
- Phone:
- 01902745151
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window