Financial history THE SPALDING ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 220077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £218.99k £228.66k £245.30k £269.36k £287.85k
Total expenditure £154.90k £167.65k £192.24k £457.53k £291.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A