Accounts and annual returns ANNIE PAHUD ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 220155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required