Trustees ANNIE PAHUD ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 220155

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Terry Steele | Chair | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Murray Purves | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Henderson-Blair | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Clough | Trustee | 25 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Brookes | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANN PERKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY HOLMQUEST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.