Financial history THE JOHN HENRY KEENE MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 220807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £238.77k £214.59k £221.23k £261.36k £283.94k
Total expenditure £121.75k £160.56k £135.14k £217.92k £185.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A