TIFFIELD REFORMATORY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was founded by Benefactors giving land in the Parish of Tiffield. This land was given to be used to provide a base on which to build a reformatory school and its successors. The charity is charged with this responsibility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR ROBERT HEYGATE MA DL | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicholas Alexander Heygate | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 04 January 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 21.4.1906 AND BOARD OF EDUCATION SCHEME 12.12.1907.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF TIFFIELD REFORMATORY SCHOOL, BEING A SCHOOL DULY CERTIFIED UNDER THE REFORMATORY SCHOOL ACT 1866.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIFFIELD REFORMATORY SCHOOL
C/O BUGBROOKE MILLS
BUGBROOKE
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
NN7 3QH
- Phone:
- 01604 830381
- Email:
- heygatear@heygates.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window