Financial history THE JOSEPHINE BUTLER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 220923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.87k £16.27k £14.05k £24.32k £28.37k
Total expenditure £26.74k £6.77k £21.68k £25.59k £12.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A