DOROTHY BATHURST'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants to individuals at Christmas, and at other times to a range of deserving organisations that provide support services to the disadvantaged in the civil Parish of Goudhurst.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 27 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN BARRY NOAKES | Chair | 14 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Christina Mary Gallagher | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DOUGLAS BUSHROD | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|||||
JANE DORIS DAVIDSON | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANN OLLEY | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY VERNON BASIL FARNFIELD MBE | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £1.29k | £1.56k | £1.19k | £1.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £1.31k | £1.92k | £890 | £520 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 May 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18TH AUGUST 1980 as amended on 14 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF GOUDHURST WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 22 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GOUDHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beech Cottage
Lidwells Lane
Goudhurst
Cranbrook
TN17 1EP
- Phone:
- 01580211875
- Email:
- r.bushrod@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window