Accounts and annual returns THOMPSON'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 222571
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 May 2022 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 May 2022 562 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 May 2022 928 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required