Financial history LIVERPOOL SCHOOL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE

Charity number: 222655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £228.07m £210.34m £196.65m £154.80m £127.82m
Total expenditure £216.09m £205.55m £203.31m £146.90m £105.59m
Income from government contracts £2.09m £1.81m £1.54m £983.00k £438.00k
Income from government grants £21.44m £20.78m £16.19m £14.82m £16.79m
Income - Donations and legacies £453.00k £450.00k £421.00k £234.00k £490.00k
Income - Other trading activities £847.00k £523.00k £814.00k £1.07m £1.24m
Income - Charitable activities £225.69m £208.04m £194.86m £152.28m £123.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.08m £1.33m £561.00k £1.21m £3.00m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £421.00k £234.00k £490.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £215.59m £204.97m £202.70m £146.10m £104.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £267.00k £430.00k £376.00k £428.00k £528.00k
Expenditure - Governance £163.00k £205.00k £204.00k £358.00k £337.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £159.00k £159.00k £171.00k £100.00k £130.00k
Expenditure - Other £235.00k £148.00k £239.00k £374.00k £424.00k