HIGHBURY THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates as a theatre company situated in North Birmingham. It promotes, maintains, improves, and advances education through the performance arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £2,230 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 January 1970: Standard registration
- HIGHBURY LITTLE THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BOWYER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Irene Lane | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lea-Redmond | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Noakes | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Christopher Walker | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Robert Agnew | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Irons | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JAYNE CAHILL | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Owen | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS S HAYNES MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH PARRY | Trustee |
|
||||||
GWENDOLINE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.70k | £61.35k | £93.95k | £227.85k | £117.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.24k | £70.73k | £109.08k | £117.21k | £125.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £19.94k | N/A | N/A | £2.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD 4ANUARY 1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED,28TH NOVEMBER 1952,9TH DECEMBER 1969 AND 8 DECEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PERFORMING AND PRACTISING ARTS INCLUDING DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, FILM, MUSIC AND THE VISUAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SUTTON COLDFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highbury Theatre Centre
Sheffield Road
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 5HD
- Phone:
- 01213732761
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window