Financial history WILLIAM ROUNDEL AND OTHERS

Charity number: 224043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £747 £769 £1.01k £1.21k £1.14k
Total expenditure £670 £371 £280 £1.14k £812
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A