ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PEMBROKESHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 224339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RSPCA Pembrokeshire Branch provides funding assistance for treatment for health problems, veterinary advice and funding assistance for operations on animals. provide treatment for health problems,veterinary advice and funding assistance for operations on animals. Provides Voucher, Neutering and Microchipping schemes. Provides for fostering and rehoming of stray, Case and unwanted animals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £40,259
Total expenditure: £40,859

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA PEMBROKESHIRE BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA - PEMBROKESHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL BAXTER Chair 22 February 2017
RSPCA Wyth Sir Branch
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
paul Draycott Trustee 22 February 2017
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WARRINGTON, HALTON AND ST HELENS BRANCH
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Michael Stuart Tomlinson Trustee 22 February 2017
RSPCA RADCLIFFE SHELTER TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS PRESTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.29k £25.92k £24.71k £23.67k £40.26k
Total expenditure £43.52k £83.34k £17.83k £29.49k £40.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
R S P C A
Parkside Buildings
Chart Way
Horsham
West Sussex
RH12 1GY
Phone:
0300 123 8902
Email:
No information available