Financial history WHITBY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 224512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.79k £4.64k £4.17k £6.28k £9.21k
Total expenditure £2.38k £2.39k £3.21k £1.32k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A