Trustees WHITBY UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 224512

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nock | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Clive Pearson | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Neil Russell Swannick | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Phillip Trumper | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Reynolds | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Booth | Trustee | 06 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Wild | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|||||||
Glenn Goodberry | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Reverend Father Michael George Gobbett | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
John Freeman | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MORTIMER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.