BRIGHOUSE WAR MEMORIAL (NURSES' ENDOWMENT) FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to people in need who reside in the former Borough of Brighouse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Calderdale
Governance
- 31 July 1963: Standard registration
- BRIGHOUSE WAR MEMORIAL (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Jayne Reed | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jonathan Paul Webb | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Michelle Petch | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sophie Whittaker | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Dilly | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Krystina Benton | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kirk | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Oliver Willows | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Blagbrough | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Pillai | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charles Hopkinson | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pam Fellowes | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MONTEITH | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|||||
HOWARD BLAGBROUGH | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BLAGBROUGH | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR DAVID KIRTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £6.28k | £6.40k | £6.53k | £6.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £395 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST-28TH AUGUST 1925 SCHEME DATED 4.3.1963
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF THE SERVICES OF SUCH NURSES AND OTHER PERSONS AND SUCH COMFORTS AS MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSES OF MINISTERING TO THE WANTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF BRIGHOUSE AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME PARTICULARLY THE WOUNDED OR CONVALESCENT EX-SERVICE MEN.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BRIGHOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calderdale Borough Council
Town Hall
Halifax
HX1 1UJ
- Phone:
- 01422 393013
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window