Financial history ROYAL BRITISH LEGION POPPY FACTORY LIMITED

Charity number: 225348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.32m £4.13m £4.09m £4.54m £4.60m
Total expenditure £4.02m £4.66m £4.72m £5.21m £4.94m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £668.91k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20m £1.10m £1.10m £892.30k £891.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £440.70k £482.00k £114.44k £90.64k
Income - Charitable activities £1.86m £1.78m £1.64m £2.08m £1.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £799.45k £812.66k £869.75k £1.46m £1.95m
Income - Other £465.73k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.37m £3.56m £3.69m £3.81m £3.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £648.23k £1.10m £1.02m £1.40m £1.41m
Expenditure - Governance £17.10k £15.46k £22.29k £22.33k £25.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £353.70k £392.17k £478.50k £1.02m £1.03m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0