Accounts and annual returns JAMES THOMSON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 225888
Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required