JAMES THOMSON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 225888
Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The money was given to the Hamsterley & South Bedburn war memorial fund.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £10
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK ALAN COATSWORTH Trustee 02 September 2011
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET HESLOP Trustee
POOR'S LAND AND STOCK CHARITY
Received: On time
MR MALCOLM MAUGHAN Trustee
POOR'S LAND AND STOCK CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30 £30 £21 £20 £10
Total expenditure £44 £44 £20 £20 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 921 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOPPYLAND FARM
HOPPYLAND
HAMSTERLEY
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 3NP
Phone:
01388488752
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available